Engine Parts Group, Inc. v. Engines Pro, LLC
Plaintiff: Engine Parts Group, Inc.
Defendant: Engines Pro, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01520
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Parties' failure to file a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form by the deadline set in this court's #6 Order, a telephonic Status Conference is SET for 8/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, to be vacated upon the filing of a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976# at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/30/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/25/2021, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/3/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/10/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Engines Pro, LLC re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Engine Parts Group, Inc.. (Milgrom, Amanda)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Engines Pro, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7902238)Attorney Amanda L. Milgrom added to party Engine Parts Group, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Engine Parts Group, Inc..(Milgrom, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engine Parts Group, Inc. v. Engines Pro, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Engine Parts Group, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda L. Milgrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engines Pro, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?