Miller v. Karcher North America Inc
Plaintiff: John D Miller
Defendant: Karcher North America Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01552
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 2302
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff John D Miller All parties consent.. (Wylie, Jonathan)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 July 2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for September 8, 2021 in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is reset to September 2, 2021 at 10:15 a.m. Litigants and counsel whose offices are located outside the Denver metropolitan area or who cannot reasonably make a personal appearance may appear by telephone. Please contact Chambers at (303) 844-4507 two businesses days before the Scheduling Conference to arrange a telephonic appearance. Consent Form due by 8/25/2021. (cmadr, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John D Miller. Karcher North America Inc waiver sent on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Acho, James)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Karcher North America, Inc re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff John D Miller. (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice of Suit and Waiver sent to Defendant)(Wylie, Jonathan)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 16 June 2021. Consent Form due by 8/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/1/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Litigants and counsel whose offices are located outside the Denver metropolitan area or who cannot reasonably make a personal appearance may appear by telephone. Please contact Chambers at (303) 844-4507 five businesses days before the Scheduling Conference to arrange a telephonic appearance. (cmadr, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Plaintiff by Jonathan D. Wylie on behalf of John D MillerAttorney Jonathan D. Wylie added to party John D Miller(pty:pla) (Wylie, Jonathan)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Karcher North America Inc (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7906792)Attorney James R. Acho added to party John D Miller(pty:pla), filed by John D Miller.(Acho, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Karcher North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Miller
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wylie
Represented By: James R. Acho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karcher North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?