Westchester Fire Insurance Company v. MVA Wall Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Mark Volosin, MVA Wall Systems, LLC, David Volosin and Joanna Tejero
Case Number: 1:2021cv01556
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MVA Wall Systems, LLC, David Volosin, Mark Volosin re #7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants MVA Wall Systems, LLC, Mark Volosin and David Volosin, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (evana, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/29/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants MVA Wall Systems, LLC, Mark Volosin and David Volosin Attachment to Exhibit 4 to Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants MVA Wall Systems, LLC, Mark Volosin and David Volosin by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Cantrell, Connor)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants MVA Wall Systems, LLC, Mark Volosin and David Volosin by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Return of Service for David Volosin, #2 Exhibit 2 - Return of Service for Mark Volosin, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service for MVA Wall Systems, LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Connor L. Cantrell, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order on Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants MVA Wall Systems, LLC, Mark Volosin and David Volosin)(Cantrell, Connor)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. MVA Wall Systems, LLC served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/24/2021. (Cantrell, Connor)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. Mark Volosin served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/24/2021. (Cantrell, Connor)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. David Volosin served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/24/2021. (Cantrell, Connor)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MVA Wall Systems, LLC, Joanna Tejero, David Volosin, Mark Volosin (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7907213)Attorney Connor Lee Cantrell added to party Westchester Fire Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bonds, #2 Exhibit 2 - GIA, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to D Volosin, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to J Tejero, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to M Volosin, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons - David Volosin, #8 Summons Summons - Joanna Tejero, #9 Summons Summons - Mark Volosin, #10 Summons Summons - MVA Wall Systems, LLC)(Cantrell, Connor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westchester Fire Insurance Company v. MVA Wall Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Volosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVA Wall Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Volosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Tejero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Connor Lee Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?