Estate of George Moshinsky et al v. USA
Plaintiff: George Moshinsky, Estate of George Moshinsky and George Fedynskyj
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01561
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 August 2021. At the request of the parties, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for August 26, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for November 3, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 3-1) on or before October 21, 2021. (cmadr, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10 June 2021. Consent Form due by 8/6/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/19/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7907560)Attorney David A. Sprecace added to party Estate of George Moshinsky(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Sprecace added to party George Moshinsky (Deceased)(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Sprecace added to party George Fedynskyj, Personal Representative(pty:pla), filed by Estate of George Moshinsky, George Fedynskyj, Personal Representative, George Moshinsky (Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sprecace, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of George Moshinsky et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Moshinsky
Represented By: David A. Sprecace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of George Moshinsky
Represented By: David A. Sprecace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Fedynskyj
Represented By: David A. Sprecace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?