North Avenue Capital, LLC v. Appogee Kazmira, LLC
Plaintiff: North Avenue Capital, LLC
Defendant: Appogee Kazmira, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01570
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/5/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/5/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 .All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-1570-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff North Avenue Capital, LLC All parties do not consent.. (McKay, Brandi)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 Appogee Kazmira, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM against North Avenue Capital, LLC by Appogee Kazmira, LLC.(Layden, Michael)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Layden on behalf of Appogee Kazmira, LLCAttorney Michael T. Layden added to party Appogee Kazmira, LLC(pty:dft) (Layden, Michael)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Collins Prendergast on behalf of Appogee Kazmira, LLCAttorney Brian Collins Prendergast added to party Appogee Kazmira, LLC(pty:dft) (Prendergast, Brian)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North Avenue Capital, LLC. Appogee Kazmira, LLC served on 7/10/2021, answer due 8/1/2021. (McKay, Brandi)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North Avenue Capital, LLC. Appogee Kazmira, LLC served on 7/11/2021, answer due 8/1/2021. (McKay, Brandi)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10 June 2021. Consent Form due by 8/4/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/11/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by attorney Brandi McKay. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McKay, Brandi)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Appogee Kasmira, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7909099)Attorney Brandi Jo McKay added to party North Avenue Capital, LLC(pty:pla), filed by North Avenue Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(McKay, Brandi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Avenue Capital, LLC v. Appogee Kazmira, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appogee Kazmira, LLC
Represented By: Brian Collins Prendergast
Represented By: Michael T. Layden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Avenue Capital, LLC
Represented By: Brandi Jo McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?