Echols v. Praetorian Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Echols
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company and QBE Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01590
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendants Praetorian Insurance Company, QBE Americas, Inc.. (Freda, Matthew) Modified on 7/28/2021 correct event (jgonz, ).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/11/2021. Consent due 8/11/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/16/2021. (evaug ) Modified on 6/16/2021 (evaug ).
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Praetorian Insurance Company by Plaintiff Tammy Echols. (Florin, Chase)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7911306)Attorney Chase P. Florin added to party Tammy Echols(pty:pla), filed by Tammy Echols. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Florin, Chase)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echols v. Praetorian Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Robert Freda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Robert Freda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Echols
Represented By: Chase P. Florin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?