Hollister v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Edward Hollister
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company and Christopher R Verschoor
Case Number: 1:2021cv01600
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and for Enlargement of Time to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2021 09:45 AM is VACATED and RESET for 9/22/2021 11:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall submit a joint Proposed Scheduling Order by 9/15/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/12/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Reset August 19, 2021 Scheduling Conference and Extend Deadline to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Shurtleff, Lance)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Hollister. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Caldwell, Robert)
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Shurtleff, Lance)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Edward Caldwell, Jr on behalf of Edward HollisterAttorney Robert Edward Caldwell, Jr added to party Edward Hollister(pty:pla) (Caldwell, Robert)
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(Shurtleff, Lance)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2021 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/5/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/19/2021. (jgonz, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Jordan, Paul)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul W. Jordan, Jr on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance CompanyAttorney Paul W. Jordan, Jr added to party Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Jordan, Paul)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company on 05/13/2021 (cpomm, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Christopher R Verschoor, filed by Edward Hollister.(cpomm, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Filing Notice of Removal by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USDC Notice of Removal)(Shurtleff, Lance)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Shurtleff, Lance)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company from Boulder District Court, Case Number 2021CV30342. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7912825), filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - CSC Notice of Service of Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Colorado Secretary of State Certific, #6 Exhibit F - District Court Register of Actions, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Shurtleff, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollister v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hollister
Represented By: Robert Edward Caldwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance E. Shurtleff
Represented By: Paul W. Jordan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?