USA v. 2015 Cadillac CTS, VIN: 1G6AP5SX2F0137573 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2015 Cadillac CTS, VIN: 1G6AP5SX2F0137573, 2018 Chevrolet Silverado 1500 Crew Cab, VIN: 3GCUKTEJXJG159541 and $6,130.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2021cv01606
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Claim by Defendant $6,130.00 in United States Currency (Migoya, Carlos)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture (2) by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Hurd, Laura)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/15/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/15/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $6,130.00 in United States Currency, 2015 Cadillac CTS, VIN: 1G6AP5SX2F0137573, 2018 Chevrolet Silverado 1500 Crew Cab, VIN: 3GCUKTEJXJG159541 Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hurd, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2015 Cadillac CTS, VIN: 1G6AP5SX2F0137573 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Cadillac CTS, VIN: 1G6AP5SX2F0137573
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 Chevrolet Silverado 1500 Crew Cab, VIN: 3GCUKTEJXJG159541
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,130.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Laura Beth Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?