Ping Identity Corporation v. SCE Consultants, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ping Identity Corporation
Defendant: SCE Consultants, Inc and SCE Technologies, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01629
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the court on the #14 Joint Notice of Settlement. The Parties shall file dismissal papers on or before 9/3/2021. Moreover, in light of the parties' settlement, the Scheduling Conference set by this court's #5 Order is hereby RE-SET for 9/23/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Parties' deadline to file a Proposed Scheduling Order is RE-SET for 9/16/2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/12/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/12/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Ping Identity Corporation All parties consent.. (Field, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 8/11/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Consent Form due by 8/12/2021. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the court on the Parties' #14 Notice of Settlement. A Telephonic Status Conference hereby set for 8/11/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information to participate at the designated time: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/06/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint Notice of Settlement) by Plaintiff Ping Identity Corporation (Field, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 8/6/2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/23/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants SCE Consultants, Inc, SCE Technologies, Inc. (Mendez, Diana)
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SCE Group, Inc. for SCE Consultants, Inc, SCE Technologies, Inc. (Mendez, Diana)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants SCE Technologies, Inc, SCE Consultants, Inc. SCE Technologies, Inc answer due 7/23/2021; SCE Consultants, Inc answer due 7/23/2021. (Mendez, Diana)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Diana Marie Mendez on behalf of SCE Consultants, Inc, SCE Technologies, IncAttorney Diana Marie Mendez added to party SCE Consultants, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Diana Marie Mendez added to party SCE Technologies, Inc(pty:dft) (Mendez, Diana)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #5 Order, by Plaintiff Ping Identity Corporation. (Nitta, Chad)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ping Identity Corporation. SCE Consultants, Inc served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Nitta, Chad)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ping Identity Corporation. SCE Technologies, Inc served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Nitta, Chad)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/17/21, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form Consent Form due by 8/4/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/11/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/18/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ROARING FORK INTERMEDIATE LLC, Other Affiliate Ping Identify Holding Corp for Ping Identity Corporation. (Field, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against SCE Consultants, Inc., SCE Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7915500)Attorney Chad Takashi Nitta added to party Ping Identity Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Ping Identity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nitta, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ping Identity Corporation v. SCE Consultants, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCE Consultants, Inc
Represented By: Diana Marie Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCE Technologies, Inc
Represented By: Diana Marie Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ping Identity Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Julianne Field
Represented By: Chad Takashi Nitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?