Honnemann v. Shambhala Publications, Inc
Plaintiff: Peter Honnemann
Defendant: Shambhala Publications, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01643
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Shambhala Publications, Inc.(Daniels, Joseph)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Shambhala Publications, Inc. Shambhala Publications, Inc answer due 8/2/2021. (Daniels, Joseph)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 9-21-2021 at 10:00 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9-14-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#3-3] is due 9-14-2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6-23-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Honnemann. Shambhala Publications, Inc served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Sanders, Craig)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shambhala Publications, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7917519)Attorney Craig Benjamin Sanders added to party Peter Honnemann(pty:pla), filed by Peter Honnemann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honnemann v. Shambhala Publications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Honnemann
Represented By: Craig Benjamin Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shambhala Publications, Inc
Represented By: Joseph C. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?