Montoya v. Warden of Buena Vista Correctional Facility et al
Defendant: No Named Respondent
Petitioner: Chuck Montoya
Respondent: Warden of Buena Vista Correctional Facility and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2021cv01646
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED. If Applicant fails to pay the $5.00 filing fee within the time allowed, the habeas corpus application will be denied and the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 07/09/2021. (athom, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Chuck Montoya.(evana, ) Modified on 7/9/2021 to correct text (athom, ).
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Chuck Montoya. (evana, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Chuck Montoya. (evana, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by Petitioner Chuck Montoya. (evana, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. The Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff two blank copies of the following court-approved forms, and one copy of the applicable instructions: (1) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action; (2) Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 (which Applicant shall use if he is challenging the validity of his state conviction and/or sentence); (3) Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (which Applicant shall use if he is challenging the execution of his state sentence); and (4) Prisoner Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Applicant shall use court-approved forms when curing the deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The request for extension of time is denied without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 06/22/2021. (athom, ) (instructions and 2 copies of each from mailed as ordered)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 LETTER by Petitioner Chuck Montoya. (jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. Warden of Buena Vista Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Respondent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chuck Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Buena Vista Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?