ZOO Digital Limited v. Adobe, Inc.
Plaintiff: ZOO Digital Limited
Defendant: Adobe, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01693
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZOO Digital Limited. Adobe, Inc. served on 6/29/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Wernow, Howard)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 13 July 2021. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #7 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before September 20, 2021. Additionally, in the interest of judicial efficiency, it is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for August 23, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for September 21, 2021, at 1:15 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 5-1) on or before September 8, 2021.(cmadr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff ZOO Digital Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wernow, Howard)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 June 2021. Consent Form due by 8/10/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/16/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Litigants and counsel whose offices are located outside of the Denver metropolitan area or who cannot reasonably make a personal appearance may appear at scheduling conferences by telephone. Please contact Chambers at (303) 844-4507 at least two business days prior to the scheduling conference to arrange appearance by telephone. (cmadr, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ZOO Digital Group plc for ZOO Digital Limited. (Wernow, Howard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adobe, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7923528)Attorney Howard Leigh Wernow added to party ZOO Digital Limited(pty:pla), filed by ZOO Digital Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US7574103, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZOO Digital Limited v. Adobe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZOO Digital Limited
Represented By: Howard Leigh Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?