King v. Silva-Markham Partners et al
Plaintiff: John King
Defendant: Jose Silva, Holly Jackson, Bobby Nathan, Tammen Hall Apartments LLC and Silva-Markham Partners
Case Number: 1:2021cv01703
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 18 JUDGMENT re: #17 Order Dismissing Case, by Clerk on 7/28/2021. (evana, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with the June 23, 2021,Order, within the time allowed, and for failure to prosecute. That leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. That all pending motions are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/28/2021. (evana, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from John King re #11 Amended Complaint, #12 Amended Complaint, and #13 Amended Complaint. (evana, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holly Jackson, Bobby Nathan, Jose Silva, Silva-Markham Partners, Tammen Hall Apartments LLC, filed by John King.(evana, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff John King does not consent.. (evana, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 Supplemental Addendum to #8 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff John King. (evana, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION and Supporting Declaration for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff John King. (evana, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holly Jackson, Bobby Nathan, Jose Silva, Silva-Markham Partners, Tammen Hall Apartments LLC, filed by John King.(evana, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION and Supporting Declaration for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff John King. (evana, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holly Jackson, Bobby Nathan, Jose Silva, Silva-Markham Partners, Tammen Hall Apartments LLC, filed by John King.(evana, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff John King. (evana, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from John King re #6 Order to Cure Deficiencies (evana, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. That Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Lexis-Nexis, ECF No. #4 , is DENIED as improperly filed in this action, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/23/2021.(evana, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 CD - Exhibit M to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff John King. Placed in Clerk's Office, Oversized Area A-7-2. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Compel Lexis Nexis to provide reasonably priced access to Legal research for in pro-se parties litigation for as long as public law libraries are closed, by Plaintiff John King. (evana, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff John King. (trvo, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT and Supporting Declaration for T.R.O. Enjoining Eviction from HUD Housing in Retaliation for Attempted Community Organization and Enforcement of ADA and Other Federally Protected Civil Rights against Holly Jackson, Bobby Nathan, Jose Silva, Silva-Markham Partners, Tammen Hall Apartments LLC, filed by John King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Silva-Markham Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammen Hall Apartments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva-Markham Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?