Buck v. Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Melinda Buck
Defendant: Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company d/b/a Liberty Mutual and Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01766
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01766-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company. (Ross-Shannon, Bradley)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Ross-Shannon, Bradley)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory F. Szydlowski on behalf of Liberty Mutual General Insurance CompanyAttorney Gregory F. Szydlowski added to party Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Szydlowski, Gregory)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 Answer and Jury Demand ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company.(Ross-Shannon, Bradley)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 8/25/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/25/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/30/2021. (evaug )
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Suzanne Coley on behalf of Melinda BuckAttorney Jordan Suzanne Coley added to party Melinda Buck(pty:pla) (Coley, Jordan)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company on 06/07/2021. (trvo, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company, filed by Melinda Buck.(trvo, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORDS from Pueblo County District Court by Defendant Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company d/b/a Liberty Mutual. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet - State Court Action, #2 Exhibit Summons - State Court Action, #3 Exhibit Complaint - State Court Action, #4 Exhibit Return of Service - State Court Action, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Removal - State Court Action, #6 Exhibit Exhibit to Defendant's Notice of Removal - State Court Action)(Ross-Shannon, Bradley)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company d/b/a Liberty Mutual from Pueblo County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30206. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7935269), filed by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company d/b/a Liberty Mutual. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendant's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Defendant's Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Defendant's Notice of Removal)(Ross-Shannon, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company d/b/a Liberty Mutual
Represented By: Bradley Ross-Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory F. Szydlowski
Represented By: Bradley Ross-Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Buck
Represented By: Jordan Suzanne Coley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?