Sanderson v. United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keith Sanderson
Defendant: United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee, UNITED STATES CENTER FOR SAFESPORT, INC, USA SHOOTING, INC, United States Center for SafeSport, Inc. and USA Shooting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01771
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 36 U.S.C. ยง 220501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 28 FINAL JUDGMENT re: #27 Order Dismissing Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Entered by Clerk on 7/29/2021. (swest)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Dismissing Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The instant action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/29/2021. (swest)
July 27, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #14 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration of July 6, 2021 TRO Ruling filed by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson. (Smith, Mitchell)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting #21 Motion for Leave to Restrict. Doc. #20 shall have a Level 1 Restriction. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/27/2021. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
July 27, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEF in Support of #14 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration of July 6, 2021 TRO Ruling filed by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson. (Smith, Mitchell)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Defendant United States Center for SafeSport's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction challenges the Court's subject matter jurisdiction over this action. See (Doc. #19 at 1-3, 6-10). Plaintiff shall file his Reply by 7/29/2021. Therein, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/21/2021. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph J. Zonies on behalf of United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.Attorney Joseph J. Zonies added to party United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.(pty:dft) (Zonies, Joseph)
July 23, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lipes, Ryan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 20 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: EXHIBIT B to #19 Response by Defendant United States Center for SafeSport, Inc... (Lipes, Ryan) (Modified on 7/26/2021 edited to give the title of the document filed)(evana, ).
July 23, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition to #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #14 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration of July 6, 2021 TRO Ruling filed by Defendant United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dennis Evans, #2 Exhibit A - SafeSport Code, #3 Exhibit B - Restricted (placeholder), #4 Exhibit C - Email, #5 Exhibit D - Email, #6 Exhibit E - Email exchange, #7 Affidavit of Matt Suggs, #8 Exhibit F - Lake Athlete Replacement Policy)(Lipes, Ryan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Order to Defendant US Center For SafeSport, Inc. by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson (Smith, Mitchell)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE Certification of Service by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson (Smith, Mitchell)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Lipes on behalf of United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.Attorney Ryan Patrick Lipes added to party United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lipes, Ryan)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Plaintiff' s Emergency Motion for Reconsideration to the extent it seeks reconsideration of the portion of this Court's July 6, 2021 Order that denied as moot Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #5 ). Therefore, pursuant to this Court's June 30, 2021 Order, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #5 ) remains DENIED to the extent it seeks a TRO and remains TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT to the extent it seeks a preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. #14 ) is DENIED in all other respects, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/19/2021.(evana, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration of July 6, 2021 TRO Ruling by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson. (Smith, Mitchell)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLATORY AND INUNCTIVE RELIEF against United States Center for SafeSport, Inc., filed by Keith Sanderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Edits--2nd Amendmended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1--Safesport Disposition, #3 Exhibit 2--USOPC Dispo Letter, #4 Exhibit 3--SafeSport Offer to Arbitrate, #5 Exhibit 4-SafeSport Canx of Arbitration, #6 Summons SafeSport Waiver of Service-Amended Complaint)(Smith, Mitchell)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: DENYING AS MOOT #5 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and #10 Emergency Motion for Reconsideration. In his Motion for Reconsideration, Plaintiff represents for the first time that former Defendant United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee ("USOPC") "must submit its Final Roster [of Olympic competitors] to the [International Olympic Committee] no later than 7/5/2021" and that Olympic competitors "cannot be added to the roster at a later date." It is manifest from Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration that the injunctive relief he seeks in both his Motion for Reconsideration and his TRO Motion is now unavailable. See (Doc. #10 at 6) ("Any order form [sic] the Court [granting Plaintiff the relief sought in his TRO Motion] would need to be by 7/4/2021 so as to allow the USOPC to ensure Sanderson is on the final roster."). Accordingly, both Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/6/2021. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 Party USA Shooting, Inc. (a Colorado nonprofit corporation) and United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee (a District of Columbia corporation) terminated pursuant to the #8 NOTICE of withdrawal of his request for relief,without prejudice,filed in this case on 7/1/2021. Text Only Entry (evana, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for TRO,,, by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson. (Smith, Mitchell)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Keith Sanderson, filed by Keith Sanderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amendment Tracking)(Smith, Mitchell)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party USA Shooting, Inc US Olympic & Paralympic Committee by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson (Smith, Mitchell)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Plaintiff's Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ( Doc. # [5)] is DENIED to the extent it seeks a temporary restraining order and is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT to the extent it seeks a preliminary injunction; Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), the Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #5 ), and a copy of this Order, in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by July 7, 2021, and shall file a certificate of service confirming his compliance with this directive by no later than July 8, 2021, at 3 p.m.; Defendants shall respond to the portion of the Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order that requests a preliminary injunction by no later than July 14, 2021; and Upon receipt of Defendants' response brief(s), the Court will consider whether a hearing on the Motion is necessary, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/30/2021.(evana, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01771-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USOPC Letter 23-Jun-2021, #2 Exhibit SafeSport Final Decision Email 23-Jun-2021)(Smith, Mitchell)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Keith Sanderson. (Smith, Mitchell) Modified on 6/29/2021 to correct event (jgonz, ).
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declatory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES CENTER FOR SAFESPORT, INC, United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee, USA SHOOTING, INC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7935588)Attorney Mitchell Dean Smith added to party Keith Sanderson(pty:pla), filed by Keith Sanderson.(Smith, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson v. United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CENTER FOR SAFESPORT, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA SHOOTING, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Center for SafeSport, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Zonies
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Lipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Shooting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Sanderson
Represented By: Mitchell Dean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?