Securities and Exchange Commission v. SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC, Clement M. Borkowski, Convergence Group, LLC, The, Joseph P. Schiff and Sean A. Hawkins
Case Number: 1:2021cv01776
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0080
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/26/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission All parties consent.. (Atkinson, Polly)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark L. Williams on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange CommissionAttorney Mark L. Williams added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Williams, Mark)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Joseph P. Schiff waiver sent on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/11/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Sean A. Hawkins waiver sent on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/11/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Clement M. Borkowski waiver sent on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/11/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Convergence Group, LLC, The waiver sent on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/11/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC waiver sent on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/11/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Blaine Kenneth Bengtson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Clement M. Borkowski(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Convergence Group, LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Sean A. Hawkins(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Joseph P. Schiff(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Bengtson, Blaine)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Leo Vorndran on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Paul Leo Vorndran added to party Clement M. Borkowski(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Leo Vorndran added to party Convergence Group, LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Leo Vorndran added to party Sean A. Hawkins(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Leo Vorndran added to party Joseph P. Schiff(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Leo Vorndran added to party SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Vorndran, Paul)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 8/25/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/25/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/30/2021. (evaug )
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLEMENT M. BORKOWSKI, SEAN A. HAWKINS, JOSEPH P. SCHIFF, SKIHAWK CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC, THE CONVERGENCE GROUP, LLC Attorney Polly Arlene Atkinson added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC, #3 Summons The Convergence Group, LLC, #4 Summons Clement M. Borkowski, #5 Summons Sean A. Hawkins, #6 Summons Joseph P. Schiff)(Atkinson, Polly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SkiHawk Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement M. Borkowski
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergence Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Schiff
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean A. Hawkins
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Polly Arlene Atkinson
Represented By: Mark L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?