Kirchner v. Marshall et al
Petitioner: Jesse Dillon Kirchner
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and Jill Marshall
Case Number: 1:2021cv01809
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 USCA ORDER Denying #7 Motion for an Order Authorizing a Successive Motion under 28 U.S.C. 2244 USCA case number 19-1185 on 8/6/2021. (angar, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #8 Order of Dismissal on 8/6/2021. (angar, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No. [5) is accepted and adopted. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/6/2021. (angar, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 DISREGARD duplicate - see ECF #7 LETTER from U.S. Court of Appeals advising they have docketed Jesse Dillon Kirchner Motion for permission to file a second or successive habeas petition under 28 U.S.C. 2244. USCA Case 21-1257 (angar, ) Modified on 8/9/2021 (angar, ).
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from U.S. Court of Appeals advising they have docketed Sireino Jesse Dillon Kirchner Motion for Permission to file a second or successive habeas petition under 28 U.S.C. 2255. USCA Case 21-1257. (Attachments: #1 Motion) (angar, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Memorandum of Law in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus Petition by Petitioner Jesse Dillon Kirchner (Attachments: #1 Identifying Information)(rvill, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: For the reasons set forth herein, this Magistrate Judge respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 (ECF No. #1 ) be denied and the action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/08/2021. (trvo, )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/7/2021. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-1809-LTB-GPG (angar, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/6/2021. (angar, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number COX099568), filed by Jesse Dillon Kirchner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirchner v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jill Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Dillon Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?