Dumitrascu v. Dumitrascu
Plaintiff: Violeta Dumitrascu
Defendant: Alin Dumitrascu
Case Number: 1:2021cv01813
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 26 COURTROOM MINUTES for Hague Convention Hearing via Video Teleconference held on 8/25/2021 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. ORDERED: The Court will take the matter under advisement and issue a written order. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (sgrim)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/24/2021, re: #19 Exhibit List, filed by Violeta Dumitrascu, #18 Exhibit List, filed by Alin Dumitrascu. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to restrict Docket Nos. 18-1, 18-8, 18-9, 19-1, 19-2, 19-3, 19-4, and 19-6 under a Level One restriction.. (sphil, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Demonstrative Material by Plaintiff Violeta Dumitrascu (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Notice of Trial Demonstrative)(Johnson, Kelsey)
August 24, 2021 Filing 23 TRIAL BRIEF Respondent's by Defendant Alin Dumitrascu. (Stein, Jonathan)
August 24, 2021 Filing 22 TRIAL BRIEF Respondent's by Defendant Alin Dumitrascu. (Stein, Jonathan)
August 23, 2021 Filing 21 TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff Violeta Dumitrascu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Pre-Trial Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Pre-Trial Brief, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Pre-Trial Brief, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Pre-Trial Brief, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Pre-Trial Brief, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Pre-Trial Brief, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Pre-Trial Brief, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Pre-Trial Brief, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Pre-Trial Brief, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Pre-Trial Brief, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Pre-Trial Brief)(Johnson, Kelsey)
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive to Exhibit List, #18 by Defendant Alin Dumitrascu. Location: 1st Floor area, Box A-1-1. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) Modified on 8/28/2021 to add text. (sphil, ).
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 Exhibit List and Exhibits by Plaintiff Violeta Dumitrascu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Nasrullah, Habib)
August 20, 2021 Filing 18 Exhibit List and Exhibits by Defendant Alin Dumitrascu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Airline Tickets, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B credit card statements, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C personal property pic, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Text re jobs, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Playroom pictures, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F Bedroom pictures, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G(2) Transcript, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H Donkey Milk purchases, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I pediatric records)(Stein, Jonathan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelsey Kay Johnson on behalf of Violeta DumitrascuAttorney Kelsey Kay Johnson added to party Violeta Dumitrascu(pty:pla) (Johnson, Kelsey)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 COURTROOM MINUTES for Status Conference via Video Teleconference held on 8/17/2021 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. ORDERED: The courtroom will remain open to the public for the August 25, 2021 hearing. The Court shall utilize a chess clock during the hearing. The attorneys are permitted to appear via video teleconference for the hearing scheduled for August 25, 2021, as discussed. Court Reporter: Kevin Carlin. (sgrim)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/16/2021, re: #1 Plaintiff's Verified Petition for the ImmediateReturn of the Minor Child to Romania. ORDERED that the Hague Convention hearing is set for August 25, 2021 at8:30 a.m. in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. ORDERED that the parties shall exchange with each other, and submit to theCourt electronically, their exhibits on or before August 20, 2021. (sphil, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/16/2021. A Status Conference with the attorneys only is set for 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and will be conducted VIA VIDEO TELECONFERENCE. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 Witness List by Defendant Alin Dumitrascu. (Stein, Jonathan)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 Witness List by Plaintiff Violeta Dumitrascu. (Nasrullah, Habib)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/02/2021. It is ORDERED that, in order for the Court to determine the appropriate length of the hearing on the Petition for the Immediate Return of the Minor Child [Docket No. #1 ], petitioner shall file a witness list, by Friday, August 6, 2021, using the form found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonPhilipABrimmer.aspx, indicating the witnesses she intends to call at the Hague Convention hearing and the length of her direct examinations. Respondent shall file, by Wednesday, August 11, 2021, a witness list for the Hague Convention hearing, which shall include estimates of the time required for cross-examining petitioners witnesses and estimates of time for conducting the direct examination of respondents witnesses. Counsel shall jointly contact Chambers via conference call (303-335-2794) on Friday, August 13, 2021, to schedule the Hague Convention hearing for the week of August 23, 2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Defendant Alin Dumitrascu. (Stein, Jonathan)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Alin Dumitrascu.(Stein, Jonathan)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Lionel Stein on behalf of Alin DumitrascuAttorney Jonathan Lionel Stein added to party Alin Dumitrascu(pty:dft) (Stein, Jonathan)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Springer on behalf of Alin DumitrascuAttorney Jeffrey Alan Springer added to party Alin Dumitrascu(pty:dft) (Springer, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Violeta Dumitrascu. Alin Dumitrascu served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Nasrullah, Habib)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibits to #1 Petition by Plaintiff Violeta Dumitrascu.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H)(Nasrullah, Habib) Modified on 7/6/2021 to add title and linkage (agarc, ).
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Violeta Dumitrascu. (Nasrullah, Habib) Modified on 7/7/2021 this is an public entry of docket no. 3 Motion to Seal Exhibits(sphil, ).
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR THE IMMEDIATE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILD TO ROMANIA PURSUANT TO 22 USC 9001, ET SEQ. AND THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF CHILD ABDUCTION (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7942355)Attorney Habib Nasrullah added to party Violeta Dumitrascu(pty:pla), filed by Violeta Dumitrascu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nasrullah, Habib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumitrascu v. Dumitrascu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alin Dumitrascu
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Springer
Represented By: Jonathan Lionel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violeta Dumitrascu
Represented By: Habib Nasrullah
Represented By: Kelsey Kay Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?