Onstream Media Corporation v. BombBomb, Inc.
Plaintiff: Onstream Media Corporation
Defendant: BombBomb, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01827
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. Defendant BombBomb, Inc.'s answer or response is now due by 9/13/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/23/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant BombBomb, Inc.. (Szewczyk, Gregory)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case, the Court requests that the parties confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 9/1/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. Without holding a Scheduling Conference, the Court will review and enter the order making such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. If the parties prefer that the Court hold a Scheduling Conference, please notify Chambers via email by the date the proposed scheduling order is due and Court staff will provide you a date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/3/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01827-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Szewczyk, Gregory)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant BombBomb, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Szewczyk, Gregory)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant BombBomb, Inc.. BombBomb, Inc. answer due 8/23/2021. (Szewczyk, Gregory)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onstream Media Corporation. BombBomb, Inc. served on 7/11/2021, answer due 8/1/2021. (Bartels, Brenda)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/1/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/1/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/7/2021. (evaug )
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Onstream Media Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7944933)Attorney Brenda L. Bartels added to party Onstream Media Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Onstream Media Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - patent 9,161,068, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - patent 9,467,728, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - patent 10,038,930, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - patent 10,200,648, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - patent 10,674,109, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - patent 10,694,142, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - patent 10,848m707, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Notice of Related Cases, #11 Plaintiff's Rule 7.1(a) Corporate Disclosure Statement, #12 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Bartels, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onstream Media Corporation v. BombBomb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onstream Media Corporation
Represented By: Brenda L. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BombBomb, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Paul Szewczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?