Telnes v. No Named Respondents
Petitioner: Angela J. Telnes
Respondent: No Named Respondents
Case Number: 1:2021cv01881
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 Clerk's Judgment, Order Reassigning Case, #5 Order Dismissing Case, Addressed to Angela J. Telnes.. (sphil, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 8/23/2021. (sphil, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order and failure to prosecute. ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal isDENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/23/2021. (sphil, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER to the Court by Petitioner Angela J. Telnes. (sphil, )
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Applicant files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/13/2021. (evana, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Angela J. Telnes.(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telnes v. No Named Respondents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angela J. Telnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Named Respondents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?