Lummus v. True
Petitioner: Jerome Lummus
Respondent: B. True
Case Number: 1:2021cv01886
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #5 Order of Dismissal on 08/23/2021. (athom, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Applicant failed to prosecute and cure the deficiencies as directed. IFP on appeal is denied without prejudice. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 08/23/2021. (athom, )
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND DENYING #2 MOTION FOR RECUSAL. If Mr. Lummus fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/13/2021. (athom, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Recusal by Petitioner Jerome Lummus. (jtorr, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Jerome Lummus.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lummus v. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerome Lummus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?