Crocs, Inc. v. Cape Robbin, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Crocs, Inc.
Defendant: CAPE ROBBIN INC.,, CROCSKY,, FULLBEAUTY BRANDS INC. d/b/a KINGSIZE, HAWKINS FOOTWEAR, SPORTS, MILITARY & DIXIE STORE, HOBIBEAR SHOES AND CLOTHING, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., INK TEE, LOEFFLER RANDALL INC., MAXHOUSE RISE LTD., PW SHOES, INC. a/k/a P&W, SHOE-NAMI, INC., Walmart Inc., YOKI FASHION INTERNATIONAL LLC, QUANZHOU ZHENGDE NETWORK CORP., d/b/a AMOJI, PW Shoes, Inc., Cape Robbin Inc., Crocsky, Fullbeauty Brands Inc. doing business as Kingsize, Hobibear Shoes and Clothing, P&W and Quanzhou ZhengDe Network Corp. doing business as Amoji
Case Number: 1:2021cv01890
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 50 Party Yoki Fashion International LLC terminated pursuant to the #49 Notice of Voluntary dismissal with prejudice and in their entirety, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees, filed in this case on 9/9/2021. Text Only Entry (evana, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Yoki Fashion International LLC by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc. (Berta, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 48 Party Fullbeauty Brands Inc. terminated pursuant to the #47 Notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice, filed in this case on 8/25/2021. Text Only Entry (evana, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party FULLBEAUTY BRANDS INC. by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc. (Berta, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 46 Party Cape Robbin Inc. terminated pursuant to the #45 Notice of Dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 8/16/2021. Text Only Entry (evana, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party CAPE ROBBIN INC. by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc. (Berta, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6 August 2021. This matter is before the court sua sponte. In light of the Order grantingDefendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay (see Dkt. # 43 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for September 14, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Before the Court is Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659 #41 , seeking a mandatory stay pending the final determination in related proceedings before the United States International Trade Commission. The Court GRANTS the Motion, and all proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/6/2021. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
August 2, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen J. Horace on behalf of Maxhouse Rise Ltd.Attorney Stephen J. Horace added to party Maxhouse Rise Ltd.(pty:dft) (Horace, Stephen)
July 30, 2021 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Johnson, Brian)
July 15, 2021 Filing 40 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (rvill, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 39 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Yoki Fashion International LLC re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 38 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Walmart Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 37 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Shoe-Nami, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 36 SUMMONS REQUEST as to PW Shoes, Inc. a/k/a P&W Shoes re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 35 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Maxhouse Rise Ltd. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 34 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Loeffler Randall Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 33 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ink Tee re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 32 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hobibear Shoes and Clothing Ltd. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 31 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hawkins Footwear, Sports, Military & Dixie Store re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Fullbeauty Brands, Inc. d/b/a Kingsize re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Crocsky re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cape Robbin, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Quanzho ZhendDe Network Corp. d/b/a Amoji re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 14, 2021 Filing 25 Administrative Notice: The summonses submitted at ECF No.'s 10-23 have an incomplete caption and not issued. A summons must name the parties. Please file properly completed summonses for issuance using the event "Summons Request." (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 14 July 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/7/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Yoki Fashion International LLC re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Walmart Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Shoe-Nami, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to PW Shoes, Inc. a/ka/ P&W Shoes re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Maxhouse Rise Ltd. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Loeffler Randall Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ink Tee re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hobibear Shoes and Clothing Ltd. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hawkins Footwear, Sports, Military & Dixie Store re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Fullbeauty Brands, Inc. d/b/a Kingsize re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Crocsky re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cape Robbin, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Quanzhou ZhengDe Network Corp. d/b/a Amoji re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crocs, Inc.. (Berta, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/13/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/13/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request (cpomm, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Anthony Berta on behalf of Crocs, Inc. (Berta, Michael)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION CROCS, INC.S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Michael Anthony Berta on behalf of Crocs, Inc. (Berta, Michael)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Berta, Michael)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7954997)Attorney Michael Anthony Berta added to party Crocs, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Crocs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons AMOJI, #5 Summons CAPE ROBBIN INC., #6 Summons CROCSKY, #7 Summons FULLBEAUTY BRANDS INC., #8 Summons HAWKINS FOOTWEAR, #9 Summons HOBIBEAR SHOES AND CLOTHING, #10 Summons HOBBY LOBBY STORES, #11 Summons INK TEE, #12 Summons LOEFFLER RANDALL INC., #13 Summons MAXHOUSE RISE LTD., #14 Summons PW SHOES, INC, #15 Summons SHOE-NAMI, INC., #16 Summons WALMART INC., #17 Summons YOKI FASHION INTERNATIONAL LLC, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berta, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crocs, Inc. v. Cape Robbin, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crocs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Anthony Berta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPE ROBBIN INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROCSKY,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLBEAUTY BRANDS INC. d/b/a KINGSIZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAWKINS FOOTWEAR, SPORTS, MILITARY & DIXIE STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBIBEAR SHOES AND CLOTHING, a Colorado Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Peter Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INK TEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOEFFLER RANDALL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXHOUSE RISE LTD.
Represented By: Stephen J. Horace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PW SHOES, INC. a/k/a P&W
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOE-NAMI, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOKI FASHION INTERNATIONAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUANZHOU ZHENGDE NETWORK CORP., d/b/a AMOJI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PW Shoes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Robbin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crocsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fullbeauty Brands Inc. doing business as Kingsize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobibear Shoes and Clothing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&W
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou ZhengDe Network Corp. doing business as Amoji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?