Strawn v. Long et al
Petitioner: Andre Strawn
Respondent: Jeff Long, Dean Williams and Phil Weiser
Case Number: 1:2021cv01897
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #11 Minute Order, to Andre Strawn, #94460, Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF), P.O. Box 6000, Sterling, CO 80751. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/10/2021. Consent Form due by 9/24/2021. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Minute Order to Petitioner at: Andre Strawn, #94460, Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF), P.O. Box 6000, Sterling, CO 80751. (alave, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 09/09/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01897-NYW. (athom, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Respondents #7 Pre-Answer Response, by Petitioner Andre Strawn. (athom, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 Order,, to File Pre-Answer Response by Respondents Jeff Long, Phil Weiser, Dean WilliamsAttorney Ellen E. Michaels added to party Jeff Long(pty:res), Attorney Ellen E. Michaels added to party Phil Weiser(pty:res), Attorney Ellen E. Michaels added to party Dean Williams(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Appendix)(Michaels, Ellen)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 Acknowledgment RECEIPT by Respondent Phil Weiser re: #4 Certificate of Service. (athom, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of the #3 Order to File Pre-Answer Response and #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Respondents Jeff Long, Dean Williams. (athom, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order to File Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process. (athom, )
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO FILE PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order. Within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. If Respondents do not intend to raise either of the affirmative defenses of timeliness or exhaustion of state court remedies, Respondents must notify the Court of that decision in the Pre-Answer Response. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/14/2021. (athom, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254 (Filing fee: $5.00, Receipt Number: COX099680), filed by Andre Strawn.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strawn v. Long et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre Strawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Long
Represented By: Ellen E. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Williams
Represented By: Ellen E. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phil Weiser
Represented By: Ellen E. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?