Batchelor v. Blazin Wings, Inc
Plaintiff: Judith Batchelor
Defendant: Blazin Wings Inc and Blazin Wings, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01900
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/31/2021. Pursuant to #18 Consent, this case is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01900-MEH. (sphil, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc All parties consent.. (Burke, Alison)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 August 2021. (cmadr, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order (also filed on behalf of Plaintiff) by Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc. (Burke, Alison)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/29/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due8/19/2021 Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jgonz, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/28/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/27/2021, re: #11 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause, Docket No. 9, is hereby DISCHARGED. (sphil, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #9 by Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voter Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Lexis Search)(Johnson, James)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Blazin Wings, Inc.(Johnson, James)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/19/2021. ORDERED that, on or before July 30, 2021, defendant shall show cause why this case should not be remanded due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary A. Ewing on behalf of Judith BatchelorAttorney Mary A. Ewing added to party Judith Batchelor(pty:pla) (Ewing, Mary)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alison Foley Burke on behalf of Blazin Wings, IncAttorney Alison Foley Burke added to party Blazin Wings, Inc(pty:dft) (Burke, Alison)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Blazin Wings, Inc, filed by Judith Batchelor.(jtorr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo Wild Wings, Corporate Parent IRB Holding Corp., Corporate Parent ARG IH LLC, Corporate Parent Inspire Brands, Inc., Corporate Parent ARG Investment Corporation for Blazin Wings Inc. (Johnson, James)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blazin Wings Inc from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 21cv31003. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7957129), filed by Blazin Wings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Waiver of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit E - Initial Procedural Order, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Docket)(Johnson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batchelor v. Blazin Wings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Batchelor
Represented By: Mary A. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blazin Wings Inc
Represented By: James Ryan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blazin Wings, Inc
Represented By: Alison Foley Burke
Represented By: James Ryan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?