AMBI Distribution Corp et al v. Doe
Plaintiff: AMBI Distribution Corp and Haymaker Films, LLC
Defendant: Doe, myflix and Mohamed Fouad aka Mohamed Gamal and Mahmoud Maher
Case Number: 1:2021cv01961
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement, DMCA violations and Unfair Competition against Mohamed Fouad aka Mohamed Gamal and Mahmoud Maher, filed by AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of ANDREW VAN DEN HOUTEN, #3 Declaration of CHRIS TAYLOR, #4 Declaration of STEPHANIE KESSNER, #5 Declaration of KERRY S. CULPEPPER, #6 Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 First MOTION for Leave to file a First Amended Complaint. Granted. The Court requests that the plaintiff file the First Amended Complaint. The clerks entry of default at ECF No. 25 is vacated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/16/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua J. Lee on behalf of AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLCAttorney Joshua J. Lee added to party AMBI Distribution Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Haymaker Films, LLC(pty:pla) (Lee, Joshua)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First MOTION for Leave to file a First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Culpepper, Kerry)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Doe re #24 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Doe aka myflix, by Clerk. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Doe aka myflix by Plaintiffs AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. Doe served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Second MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/17/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Second MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means by Plaintiffs AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Second Decl. of Kerry Culpepper)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01961-RBJ-NYW. (athom, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was reassigned in error and has been randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn pursuant to #18 Order of Recusal. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01961-REB-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) Modified on 8/11/2021 to add text (athom, ).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of Recusal by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/10/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01961-STV. (trvo, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to 14 Order,,,, Response to Order to Show Cause [Doc. #14[ by Plaintiffs AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/02/2021. IT IS ORDERED that:The Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery, and Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means #2 is GRANTED insofar as it seeks to conduct limited, expedited discovery, but DENIED to the extent it seeks leave to serve Defendant by alternative means;No later than August 23, 2021, Plaintiffs shall serve any necessary Rule 45 subpoenas, which are tailored specifically to identify Defendant. Plaintiffs are specifically advised that any issues with respect to costs must be resolved by the Plaintiffs without court intervention in the first instance. To the extent that Plaintiffs believe fee shifting is then appropriate, they can file an appropriate motion with supporting authority at the appropriate time; and No later than September 24, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file a Status Report updating the court on the progress of identifying Defendant. If Plaintiff requires additional time or additional discovery, she shall concurrently move for such relief. (alave, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/30/2021. IT IS ORDERED that: The Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restricted Access to Case File #3 is DENIED; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to unseal this case and to unrestrict the documents therein.(alave, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. In Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery and Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means #2 , Plaintiffs asked the Court, among other things, to issue a TRO ordering non-parties Name.com, Inc., CloudFlare, Inc., and Paypal, Inc. to take certain actions, including ceasing to provide services to Defendant and freezing Defendant's accounts. Plaintiffs also requested "limited expedited discovery directed to PayPal, CloudFlare, Google, and Yahoo! to determine the amount and location of the profits of the Defendant's infringements, the scope of his activities, and Doe a/k/a myflix's identity." (ECF No. 2 at 2.) By August 4, 2021, Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why Name.com, CloudFlare, Paypal, Google, and Yahoo! are not required to be joined as necessary parties to this lawsuit under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 19. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/28/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC, #3 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/28/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. On July 28, 2021, the Court issued an order denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO"), Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery and Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means #2 to the extent Plaintiffs sought a TRO. The Court REFERS the remainder of Plaintiffs' requests, specifically for leave to conduct limited expedited discovery and leave to serve Defendant by alternative means, to United States Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for a decision. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/28/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery and Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means #2 . By separate order, the Court will refer the remainder of Plaintiffs' requests to United States Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for a decision. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/28/2021. (trvo, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/ 27/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/27/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BRIEF in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in response to Court's Order [Doc. #7 ] for supplemental brief filed by Plaintiffs AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Culpepper, Kerry) Modified on 7/22/2021 to correct docket text (agarc, ).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Supplemental Briefing by Plaintiffs Addressing the Court's Personal Jurisdiction Over the Defendant and Non-Parties by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/20/2021. (wjmlc2)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restricted Access to Case File by Plaintiffs AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (jtorr, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery and Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means by Plaintiffs AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(jtorr, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Doe (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: COX099764), filed by AMBI Distribution Corp, Haymaker Films, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMBI Distribution Corp et al v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myflix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Fouad aka Mohamed Gamal and Mahmoud Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBI Distribution Corp
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haymaker Films, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?