Lee v. Hurd
Plaintiff: Suzanne C Lee
Defendant: Richard Hurd
Case Number: 1:2021cv01966
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER re: #13 Letter filed by Richard Hurd and #14 Letter filed by Suzanne C Lee. The Court has reviewed the parties' letters, ECF Nos. 13 and 14. It appears that the case might be resolvable on a ruling on the law, and therefore, the Court does not object to a motion to dismiss. The Court does not approve inclusion of any claim in the motion that opposition is substantially without justification. It might be that the defendant is right on the law, but it is not obvious. Setting that aside, and assuming for the moment that the allocation of property in the dissolution proceeding does not decide the case, in the Court's opinion both parties ought to be ashamed of themselves. For people who purportedly loved each other and wanted to make a life together, and apparently have a child together, to be scrapping like this over a piece of property suggests to this Court that you have your priorities in life all wrong. You should be able to sit down with each other like mature adults and resolve this spat in the spirit of the bond that you once had. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/13/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER re: #13 Letter Responding To Request For Leave To File Motion To Dismiss by Plaintiff Suzanne C Lee. (Oh-Willeke, Andrew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER re: #3 Notice of Lis Pendens, #2 Exhibits, #1 Complaint, by Defendant Richard Hurd. (Lawrence, Donald)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Richard Hurd answer due 9/2/2021. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/26/21. Text Only Entry(jdyne, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Richard Hurd. (Lawrence, Donald)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Richard Hurd. Richard Hurd answer due 8/26/2021. (Lawrence, Donald)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suzanne C Lee. Richard Hurd served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Drucker, Jonathan)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by R. Parker Semler on behalf of Suzanne C Lee (Semler, R.)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND COURT: R. Parker Semlerattempted to enter his appearance in this case by affixing his "s/" signature to the complaint. Counsel was removed from the attorney roll for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), his appearance cannot be recognized. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the application fee to be reinstated. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a notice of entry of appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #3 Notice of Lis Pendens, #1 Complaint, filed by attorney R. Parker Semler.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Suzanne C Lee (Drucker, Jonathan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Suzanne C Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quitclaim Deed to Suzanne Lee, #2 Exhibit Quitclaim Deed to Richard Hurd)(Drucker, Jonathan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Suzanne C Lee against Richard Hurd (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7968042)Attorney Jonathan F. Drucker added to party Suzanne C Lee(pty:pla), filed by Suzanne C Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Drucker, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne C Lee
Represented By: R. Parker Semler
Represented By: Andrew Gerhard Oh-Willeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hurd
Represented By: Donald Lawrence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?