Swenson v. Alliance Moving and Storage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Swenson, Kyle Bunting, Jamie Bunting, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Jordan Churchill, Millard McQuaid, Caitland McQuaid, Ben Warren and Meghan Warren
Defendant: Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, B.I.D. Company LLC d/b/a Real Movers, BID Company LLC doing business as Real Movers, Polaris Moving Systems Inc. doing business as Roadrunner Moving, Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC and All Time Moving Inc. doing business as Rapid Van Lines
Case Number: 1:2021cv01968
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
2 Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
3 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. § 14706 Carmack Amendment to the Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiffs (Ben Warren, Caitland McQuaid, Jamie Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Kyle Bunting, Meghan Warren, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Thomas Pevear Churchill) and against the defendants (All Time Moving Inc., Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, BID Company LLC, Polaris Moving Systems Inc., Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC). By Clerk on 7/11/23. (jdyne, )
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Default Judgment by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 7/11/23.(jdyne)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #72 Affidavit,, by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Osborne, Matthew)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT re #61 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, B.I.D. Company LLC, Polaris Moving Systems Inc, Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, and All Time Moving Inc by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ben Warren's Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment)(Osborne, Matthew)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #70 Affidavit,,, #68 Motion Hearing, #61 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, B.I.D. Company LLC, Polaris Moving Systems Inc, Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, and All Time Moving Inc, #69 Brief in Support of Motion,, by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Osborne, Matthew)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT re #61 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, B.I.D. Company LLC, Polaris Moving Systems Inc, Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, and All Time Moving Inc by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kyle Buntings Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit Jordan Churchills Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Affidavit Caitland McQuaids Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #4 Affidavit Millard McQuaids Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #5 Affidavit Thomas Pevears Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #6 Affidavit Meghan Warrens Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment)(Osborne, Matthew)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 BRIEF in Support of #61 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, B.I.D. Company LLC, Polaris Moving Systems Inc, Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, and All Time Moving Inc filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Roadrunner bill of lading, #2 Exhibit 2 - Unlimited invoice, #3 3 - All Time Moving bill of lading)(Osborne, Matthew)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney: Damages Hearing held on 6/7/2023. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Via Video. Plaintiffs may appear at the Damages Hearing remotely. Court staff will provide instructions for connecting remotely to counsel via email. by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 5/31/23. Text Only Entry(jdyne)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear via Videoconferencing at Damages Hearing 64 Minute Order by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Osborne, Matthew)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Matthew Ross Osborne (Osborne, Matthew)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER re: #61 MOTION for Default Judgment. A Damages Hearing is set for 6/7/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 5/5/2023. Text Only Entry (cnssec. )
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, BID Company LLC re #60 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, #59 MOTION for Entry of Default as to B.I.D. Company LLC, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) Modified on 10/17/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to BID Company LLC re #59 MOTION for Entry of Default as to B.I.D. Company LLC as: other (BID Company is no longer a party to the case pursuant to #46 ORDER AFFIRMING and ADOPTING the Recommendation on 5/12/2022) by Clerk. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) Modified on 10/17/2022 to edit text. (sphil, ).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, B.I.D. Company LLC, Polaris Moving Systems Inc, Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, and All Time Moving Inc by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Taylor Swenson, #2 Affidavit Kyle Bunting, #3 Affidavit Jamie Bunting, #4 Affidavit Thomas Pevear, #5 Affidavit Jordan Churchill, #6 Affidavit Millard McQuaid, #7 Affidavit Caitland McQuaid, #8 Affidavit Ben Warren, #9 Affidavit Meghan Warren, #10 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Swenson, #11 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Bunting, #12 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Churchill Pevear, #13 Proposed Order (PDF Only) McQuiad, #14 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Warren)(German, Christopher)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(German, Christopher)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Entry of Default as to B.I.D. Company LLC by Plaintiff Taylor Swenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(German, Christopher)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER re: 29 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by All Time Moving Inc.; 30 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC; 31 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Polaris Moving Systems Inc. The Court requests that plaintiff move for default judgment as to defendants All Time Moving, Unlimited Moving and Storage, and Polaris Moving Systems on or before 10/11/2022. By District Judge Charlotte N Sweeney on 8/10/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec.)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Alliance Moving and Storage LLC re #56 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Alliance Moving and Storage, LLC as: a responsive pleading has been filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Alliance Moving and Storage, LLC by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Matthew R. Osborne, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Osborne, Matthew)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney upon her appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Sweeney in Courtroom 204 in the Byron Rogers Courthouse. Her chambers are located in C-253 and her telephone number is (303) 335-2610. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01968-CNS-STV. (Text only entry) (norlin, )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #53 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order to Alliance Moving and Storage, LLC, 450 Fairway Drive, Suite 103, Deerfield Beach, FL 33441. Text Only Entry (morti, )
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/20/2022. FTR: 402. (morti, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #51 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order to Alliance Moving and Storage, LLC, 450 Fairway Drive, Suite 103, Deerfield Beach, FL 33441. Text Only Entry (morti, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Based on the representations by Mr. Smith regarding his inability tocommunicate with his client, Defendant Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #49 is GRANTED. Attorney David William Smith terminated. Status Conference set for 7/20/2022 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM regarding #49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Alliance Moving and Storage LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/21/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Alliance Moving and Storage LLC. (Smith, David)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Osborne, Matthew)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER The Status Conference set for 6/22/2022 is CONVERTED to a Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2022 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/15/2022. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/13/2022. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AFFIRMING and ADOPTING the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge #45 , filed on April 26, 2022. Defendant Alliance Moving and Storage LLC's Motion to Dismiss #18 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant B.I.D. Company LLC d/b/a Real Movers' motion to Dismiss #19 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/12/2022. (sphil, )
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 26 April 2022. For the foregoing reasons, the Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that: The Alliance Motion #18 be GRANTED to the extent it seeks to dismiss Plaintiffs' CCPA claim (Count Four) as asserted against Alliance but DENIED to the extent it seeks to dismiss Plaintiffs' remaining claims; and The Real Movers Motion #19 be GRANTED to the extent it seeks to dismiss Plaintiffs' CCPA claim (Count Four) as asserted against Real Movers but DENIED to the extent it seeks to dismiss Plaintiffs' remaining claims. (cmadr, )
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jon Topolewski is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendant BID Company, LLC d/b/a Real Movers. The Court notes that Defendant has been notified by counsel of its obligation to prepare for any hearings or trial and respond to any motions or deadlines, or hire other counsel to prepare for any such hearings, trial or motions. FURTHER, Mr. Topolewski is DIRECTED to provide Defendant with a copy of this Order forthwith. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to delete Mr. Topolewski's email address from future ECF filings and electronic notifications in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/13/2022. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for B.I.D. Company LLC d/b/a Real Movers, MOTION for Order to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Defendant BID Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Topolewski, Jon)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Discovery and Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motions. All current case deadlines in this matter are VACATED and Discovery in this matter is STAYED pending resolution of the pending motions to dismiss. A Status Conference is set for 6/22/2022 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/7/2022. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding #40 MOTION to Stay re #37 Scheduling Order filed by Thomas Pevear Churchill, Ben Warren, Kyle Bunting, Taylor Swenson, Jamie Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Meghan Warren, Millard McQuaid. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/7/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Stay re #37 Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(German, Christopher)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BID Company LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/9/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant BID Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Murtazi Sharvashidze with Exhibits)(Topolewski, Jon)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/19/2021. (morti, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/19/2021. Discovery due by 6/2/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2022 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, counsel may attend the Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2021 9:00 AM telephonically by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/15/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Osborne, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (German, Christopher)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Osborne, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Polaris Moving Systems Inc. re #28 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Polaris Moving Systems Inc., by Clerk. Text Only Entry (evana, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC re #27 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (evana, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Time Moving Inc. re #26 MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Time Moving Inc., by Clerk. Text Only Entry (evana, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Polaris Moving Systems Inc. by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(German, Christopher)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(German, Christopher)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Time Moving Inc. by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(German, Christopher)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/30/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #23 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01968-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren All parties do not consent.. (Osborne, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Polaris Moving Systems Inc. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Osborne, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Osborne, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Time Moving Inc. served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Osborne, Matthew)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant BID Company LLC. (Topolewski, Jon)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Alliance Moving and Storage LLC. (Smith, David)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Polaris Moving Systems Inc d/b/a Roadrunner Moving, Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, All Time Moving Inc d/b/a Rapid Van Lines re #15 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jamie Bunting, Kyle Bunting, Jordan Churchill, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Caitland McQuaid, Millard McQuaid, Taylor Swenson, Ben Warren, Meghan Warren. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Summons (Unlimited), #2 Proposed Document Summons (All Time))(Osborne, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, BID Company LLC, Polaris Moving Systems Inc., Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC, All Time Moving Inc., filed by Taylor Swenson, Meghan Warren, Ben Warren, Caitland McQuaid, Thomas Pevear Churchill, Kyle Bunting, Millard McQuaid, Jamie Bunting, and Jordan Churchill.(agarc, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint and Join Parties. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Dkt. No. 13-2 as Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/23/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, and Join Parties by Plaintiff Taylor Swenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Amended Complaint (redline), #2 Proposed Document Amended Complaint (clean), #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Osborne, Matthew)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendant Alliance Moving and Storage LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 9/6/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/17/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Alliance Moving and Storage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Smith, David)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David William Smith on behalf of Alliance Moving and Storage LLCAttorney David William Smith added to party Alliance Moving and Storage LLC(pty:dft) (Smith, David)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant B.I.D. Company LLC d/b/a Real Movers' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint until 9/17/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/10/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant BID Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Defendant B.I.D. Company LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Topolewski, Jon)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for David W. Hannum and Jon M. Topolewski by Jon Michael Topolewski on behalf of BID Company LLCAttorney Jon Michael Topolewski added to party BID Company LLC(pty:dft) (Topolewski, Jon)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correcting Consent Deadline. Pursuant to #5 Order TheConsent Form due by 10/5/2021. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 21 July 2021. Consent Form due by 10/5/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/12/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) Modified on 8/10/2021 to correct consent deadline (agarc, ).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Christopher German. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alliance Moving and Storage LLC, B.I.D. Company LLC d/b/a Real Movers (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7968464)Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Taylor Swenson(pty:pla), filed by Taylor Swenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Summons (Alliance), #2 Proposed Document Summons (B.I.D.))(Osborne, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swenson v. Alliance Moving and Storage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Swenson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Bunting
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Bunting
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pevear Churchill
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Churchill
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millard McQuaid
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitland McQuaid
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Warren
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Warren
Represented By: Christopher Allen German
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Moving and Storage LLC
Represented By: David William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.I.D. Company LLC d/b/a Real Movers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BID Company LLC doing business as Real Movers
Represented By: Jon Michael Topolewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Moving Systems Inc. doing business as Roadrunner Moving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unlimited Moving and Storage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Time Moving Inc. doing business as Rapid Van Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?