Harris v. Denver Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Andrew D. Harris
Defendant: Denver Sheriff's Department, Denver Health Hospital and City and County of Denver
Case Number: 1:2021cv01988
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #10 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information, #9 Second Amended Prisoner Complaint Addressed to Andrew D. Harris. (trvo, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #10 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information, #9 Second Amended Prisoner Complaint Addressed to Andrew D. Harris. (trvo, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Andrew D. Harris (trvo, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED Prisoner Complaint against Denver Health Hospital, City and County of Denver filed by Andrew D. Harris.(trvo, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within 30 days from the date of this Order, a second amended complaint on the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/18/2021. (mailed as ordered) (trvo, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. It is ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #6 ) is denied as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may proceed in this action without payment of an initial partial filing fee. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/17/2021. (trvo, ) (copy mailed as ordered)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Andrew D. Harris. (trvo, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against Denver Sheriff's Department, filed by Andrew D. Harris.(angar, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/23/2021. (trvo, ) (forms mailed as ordered)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Andrew D. Harris. (jtorr, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Denver Sheriff's Department, filed by Andrew D. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Denver Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Health Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?