Davis v. True
Plaintiff: Willie Lee Davis
Defendant: B. True and Roger Huddleston
Case Number: 1:2021cv02002
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #10 Order Dismissing Case, by Clerk on 9/7/2021. (evana, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. That the Complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. That leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. That all pending motions are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/7/2021. (evana, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER by Plaintiff Willie Lee Davis. (trvo, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Inmate Trust Account STATEMENT by Plaintiff Willie Lee Davis. (evana, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Willie Lee Davis. (evana, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Willie Lee Davis. (evana, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Willie Lee Davis. (evana, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roger Huddleston, filed by Willie Lee Davis.(evana, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/26/2021. (evana, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against B. True, filed by Willie Lee Davis.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?