Scott v. Hiller et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Thomas Scott
Defendant: Charles David Hiller, Colorado State Patrol, The, Colorado Springs Police Department, Colorado's Office of the Attorney General and Jared Polis
Case Number: 1:2021cv02011
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Order to filed by Defendant Colorado Springs Police Department. (Stewart, Brian)
September 8, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Colorado Springs Police Department. (Stewart, Brian)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION for Order to filed by Andrew Thomas Scott. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/27/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Join City of Colorado Springs as Defendant by Plaintiff Andrew Thomas Scott. (sphil, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Andrew Thomas Scott. (sphil, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Colorado Springs Police Department. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/17/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Colorado Springs Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Colorado Springs City Charter Article 1-20)(Stewart, Brian)
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Thomas Scott. Colorado State Patrol, The waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/11/2021; Jared Polis waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return Wavier of Service)(sphil, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants Colorado State Patrol, Colorado's Office of the Attorney General, Jared Polis, and Charles David Hiller shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 10/4/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/12/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Colorado's Office of the Attorney General. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/12/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Colorado's Office of the Attorney General. (Sullivan, Grant)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Grant T. Sullivan on behalf of Colorado State Patrol, The, Colorado's Office of the Attorney General, Charles David Hiller, Jared Polis (Sullivan, Grant)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Andrew Thomas Scott One party does not consent.. (sphil, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Thomas Scott. Charles David Hiller waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (sphil, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Thomas Scott. Colorado Springs Police Department served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021; Colorado State Patrol, The served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021; Colorado's Office of the Attorney General served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021; Jared Polis served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Governor Polis, #2 Proof of Service - Colorado Attorney General, #3 Proof of Service - Colorado State Patrol)(sphil, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/26/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Colorado Springs Police Department, Colorado State Patrol, The, Colorado's Office of the Attorney General, Charles David Hiller, Jared Polis Filing Fee: $402.00 Receipt Number:COX099836, filed by Andrew Thomas Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Hiller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Thomas Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles David Hiller
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado State Patrol, The
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Springs Police Department
Represented By: Brian Matthew Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado's Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Polis
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?