UMG Recordings, Inc et al v. Charter Communications, Inc
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING AB, UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING LIMITED, UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING MGB LIMITED, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC., Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, W Chappell Music Corp dba WC Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., Unichappell Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., INTERSONG U.S.A. INC., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, EMI April Music Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC. D/B/A EMI FULL KEEL MUSIC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, EMI ENTERTAINMENT WORLD INC. D/B/A EMI FORAY MUSIC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI MILLER CATALOG INC., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Agate Music, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc doing business as EMI Full Keel Music, UMG Recordings, Inc, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty Limited, Polygram Publishing, Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc, W Chappell Music Corp doing business as WC Music Corp, WCM Music Corp, Unichappell Music Inc, Cotillion Music, Inc, Intersong USA, Inc, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc doing business as EMI Longitude Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc (I), EMI Entertainment World Inc doing business as EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc, EMI Miller Catalog Inc, Jobete Music Co, Inc and Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc
Defendant: Charter Communications Inc. and Charter Communications, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv02020
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE Statement by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 17, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew)
August 31, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Charter Communications, Inc answer due 9/17/2021. (Schapiro, Andrew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Markham Tanner on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney John Markham Tanner added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Tanner, John)
August 30, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Craig D. Joyce on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Craig D. Joyce added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Joyce, Craig)
August 30, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dylan I. Scher on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Dylan I. Scher added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Scher, Dylan)
August 30, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Linda J. Brewer on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Linda J. Brewer added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Brewer, Linda)
August 30, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Eiseman, IV on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney David Eiseman, IV added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Eiseman, David)
August 30, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Andrew H. Schapiro added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Schapiro, Andrew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Charles Kramer Verhoeven added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Verhoeven, Charles)
August 17, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anders Linderot on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Cotillion Music, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI April Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc (I)(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI Entertainment World Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party EMI Miller Catalog Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Intersong USA, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Jobete Music Co, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Polygram Publishing, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Songs of Universal, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Stone Agate Music(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party UMG Recordings, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Unichappell Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal Music - MGB NA LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal Music Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal Music Publishing AB(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal Music Publishing Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal Music Publishing Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party W Chappell Music Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party WCM Music Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Warner Chappell Music, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Anders Linderot added to party Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp(pty:pla) (Linderot, Anders)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/10/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexander Kaplan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kaplan, Alexander) Modified on 8/11/2021 (rvill, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott A. Zebrak on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Zebrak, Scott) Modified on 8/11/2021 (rvill, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Oppenheim on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 8/11/2021 (rvill, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Gould on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/11/2021 (rvill, ).
August 3, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rvill, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stacey Kamya Grigsby on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Grigsby, Stacey) Modified on 8/3/2021 (rvill, ).
August 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Hardy Ehlers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ehlers, John) Modified on 8/3/2021 (rvill, ).
August 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Neema T. Sahni on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema) Modified on 8/3/2021 (rvill, ).
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Sperling on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 8/3/2021 (rvill, ).
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Charter Communications, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Cotillion Music, Inc, EMI April Music Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc (I), EMI Entertainment World Inc, EMI Feist Catalog Inc, EMI Miller Catalog Inc, Intersong USA, Inc, Jobete Music Co, Inc, Polygram Publishing, Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Agate Music, UMG Recordings, Inc, Unichappell Music Inc, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty Limited, W Chappell Music Corp, WCM Music Corp, Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Ferguson, Janette)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 Administrative Notice re: Summons Request #7 . Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. All Plaintiffs must be listed on the case caption. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/28/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/28/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally randomly assigned incorrectly, therefore this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02020-RM. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Pursuant to [#8] Order, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02020-MEH . Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE: Exercising the prerogative of a Senior Judge, the undersigned declines assignment of this case and directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this matter to another judicial officer. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/27/21. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Charter Communications, Inc. by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Cotillion Music, Inc, EMI April Music Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc (I), EMI Entertainment World Inc, EMI Feist Catalog Inc, EMI Miller Catalog Inc, Intersong USA, Inc, Jobete Music Co, Inc, Polygram Publishing, Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Agate Music, UMG Recordings, Inc, Unichappell Music Inc, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty Limited, W Chappell Music Corp, WCM Music Corp, Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Ferguson, Janette)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ferguson, Janette)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Janette L. Ferguson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ferguson, Janette)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter Communications Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7977439)Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI April Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC. D/B/A EMI FULL KEEL MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI ENTERTAINMENT WORLD INC. D/B/A EMI FORAY MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI MILLER CATALOG INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party INTERSONG U.S.A. INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Jobete Music Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Songs of Universal, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Stone Agate Music(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING AB(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING LIMITED(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING MGB LIMITED(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Unichappell Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music MGB NA LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music Z Tunes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party W Chappell Music Corp dba WC Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party W.C.M. Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Warner Chappell Music, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp(pty:pla), filed by POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC., EMI April Music Inc, UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING LIMITED, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, UMG Recordings, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC. D/B/A EMI FULL KEEL MUSIC, Stone Agate Music, EMI ENTERTAINMENT WORLD INC. D/B/A EMI FORAY MUSIC, EMI MILLER CATALOG INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING AB, Jobete Music Co., Inc., Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, W Chappell Music Corp dba WC Music Corp., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING MGB LIMITED, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, INTERSONG U.S.A. INC., Universal Music Publishing Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Ferguson, Janette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Inc et al v. Charter Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Records, LLC
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corp
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING AB
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING LIMITED
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING MGB LIMITED
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Chappell Music, Inc
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W Chappell Music Corp dba WC Music Corp.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.C.M. Music Corp.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERSONG U.S.A. INC.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI April Music Inc
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC. D/B/A EMI FULL KEEL MUSIC
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI ENTERTAINMENT WORLD INC. D/B/A EMI FORAY MUSIC
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Feist Catalog Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI MILLER CATALOG INC.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobete Music Co., Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Agate Music
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc.
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc doing business as EMI Full Keel Music
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music - MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Publishing Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty Limited
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polygram Publishing, Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W Chappell Music Corp doing business as WC Music Corp
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WCM Music Corp
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intersong USA, Inc
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc doing business as EMI Longitude Music
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc (I)
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Entertainment World Inc doing business as EMI Foray Music
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Feist Catalog Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Miller Catalog Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobete Music Co, Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc
Represented By: Alexander Kaplan
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: John Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sperling
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Stacey Kamya Grigsby
Represented By: Janette L. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Craig D. Joyce
Represented By: David Eiseman, IV
Represented By: Dylan I. Scher
Represented By: John Markham Tanner
Represented By: Linda J. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?