Kong Company LLC, The v. Piccard Meds for Pets Corp et al
Plaintiff: Kong Company, LLC, The
Defendant: Piccard Meds for Pets Corp and Marlon Martinez
Case Number: 1:2021cv02040
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marlon Martinez, Piccard Meds for Pets Corp.(Davis, Michael)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 25 August 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Piccard Meds for Pets Corp and MarlonMartinez's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or OtherwisePlead (Dkt. #11 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 8, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Marlon Martinez, Piccard Meds for Pets Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Davis, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Fitzgerald, Martha)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Utility Resetting Deadlines: Piccard Meds for Pets Corp answer due 8/25/2021. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kong Company, LLC, The. Marlon Martinez served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Wucherer, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kong Company, LLC, The. Piccard Meds for Pets Corp served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Wucherer, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel C.F. Wucherer on behalf of Kong Company, LLC, TheAttorney Daniel C.F. Wucherer added to party Kong Company, LLC, The(pty:pla) (Wucherer, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 07/29/2021. Consent Form due by 9/30/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/7/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (alave, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, MARLON MARTINEZ, PICCARD MEDS FOR PETS CORP (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7980957)Attorney Martha Louise Fitzgerald added to party Kong Company LLC, The(pty:pla), filed by Kong Company LLC, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Martinez, #3 Summons Piccard)(Fitzgerald, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kong Company LLC, The v. Piccard Meds for Pets Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kong Company, LLC, The
Represented By: Martha Louise Fitzgerald
Represented By: Daniel C.F. Wucherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piccard Meds for Pets Corp
Represented By: Michael J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon Martinez
Represented By: Michael J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?