Smith v. Safeway Inc.
Plaintiff: Ruby Smith
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02064
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/23/2021. Due to an unavoidable conflict in the court's schedule, the Telephonic Status Conference set for November 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. [Doc. 9, entered September 10, 2021] is hereby VACATED and RESET for November 22, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (agarc, ) Modified on 9/24/2021 to correct the filed date (agarc, ).
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk of the Court re: Service of Process of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form, #3 Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 4) (alave, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #9 Minute Order, to Ruby Smith, 2300 Welton Street, #141, Denver, CO 80205. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/10/2021. Consent Form due by 11/2/2021. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/9/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. A copy of this Minute Order shall be sent to: Ruby Smith, 2300 Welton Street, #141, Denver, CO 80205.
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/7/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-2064-NYW (angar, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruby Smith. Safeway Inc. waiver sent on 8/17/2021, answer due 10/16/2021. (angar, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number COX100191 (angar, )
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying #3 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. If Plaintiff fails to pay the full amount of $402.00 within the time allowed, the complaint and the action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on August 4, 2021. (rvill, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Ruby Smith. (cpomm, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Safeway Inc., filed by Ruby Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?