Gaal v. Theranostix Inc et al
Plaintiff: Steve Gaal
Defendant: Theranostix Inc a Delaware corporation doing business as P4 Diagnostix Laboratory Network and P4 Diagnostix LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02143
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kramer, Gary)
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kramer, Gary)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by P4 Diagnostix LLC.(Kramer, Gary)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Theranostix Inc.(Kramer, Gary)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 STATE COURT ORDER by Defendants P4 Diagnostix LLC, Theranostix Inc. (Kramer, Gary)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants P4 Diagnostix LLC, Theranostix Inc. (Kramer, Gary)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants P4 Diagnostix LLC, Theranostix Inc (Kramer, Gary)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Theranostix Inc, P4 Diagnostix LLC. Theranostix Inc answer due 8/30/2021; P4 Diagnostix LLC answer due 8/30/2021. (Kramer, Gary)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas J. Arckey on behalf of Steve GaalAttorney Thomas J. Arckey added to party Steve Gaal(pty:pla) (Arckey, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #10 to Allison L. Derschang and Thomas J. Arckey c/o Arckey & Associates, LLC, 6860 S. Yosemite Court, Suite 2000, Centennial, CO 80112. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10 August 2021. Consent Form due by 10/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/3/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02143-NRN. (athom, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon P4 Diagnostix LLC on 7/15/2021 (cpomm, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Theranostix Inc on 7/12/2021 (cpomm, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against P4 Diagnostix LLC, Theranostix Inc, filed by Steve Gaal.(cpomm, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Theranostix Inc, P4 Diagnostix LLC from District Court, City and County of Denver, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV32024. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8009261), filed by Theranostix Inc, P4 Diagnostix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex, B - Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Return of Service - Theranostix Inc., #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Return of Service - P4 Diagnostix LLC, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - first wage demand, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - second wage demand)(Kramer, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaal v. Theranostix Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Gaal
Represented By: Thomas J. Arckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theranostix Inc a Delaware corporation doing business as P4 Diagnostix Laboratory Network
Represented By: Gary M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P4 Diagnostix LLC
Represented By: Gary M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?