Johnson v. SSA Group LLC
Plaintiff: Mark S. Johnson
Defendant: Aramark Inc. and SSA Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02188
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Mark S. Johnson. This Court respectfully recommends that the amended Complaint (ECF No. #8 ) be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/28/2021. (trvo, )
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/27/2021. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02188-LTB-GPG. (trvo, )
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/23/2021. (trvo, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SSA Group LLC filed by Mark S. Johnson.(trvo, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SSA Group LLC filed by Mark S. Johnson.(trvo, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint that complies with all directives contained in this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/16/2021. (trvo, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is denied without prejudice as premature because this action is under initial review. Plaintiff may renew the request if this case is later drawn under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/12/2021.(angar, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Mark S. Johnson. (jsalz, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Mark S. Johnson. (jsalz, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aramark Inc., filed by Mark S. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. SSA Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?