Williams v. City of Arvada et al
Plaintiff: Brian Williams
Defendant: City of Arvada and Dan Pumphrey
Case Number: 1:2021cv02236
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Arvada, Dan Pumphrey.(Justus, Kylie)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants City of Arvada, Dan Pumphrey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Justus, Kylie)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants City of Arvada, Dan Pumphrey. (Justus, Kylie)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #7 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/06/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kylie T Justus on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kylie T Justus added to party City of Arvada(pty:dft), Attorney Kylie T Justus added to party Dan Pumphrey(pty:dft) (Justus, Kylie)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Ann Morris on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Rachel Ann Morris added to party City of Arvada(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Ann Morris added to party Dan Pumphrey(pty:dft) (Morris, Rachel)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: The #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff is signed on behalf of Defendants by attorney Kylie Justus, who has not entered an appearance in this matter. Attorney Justus must enter her appearance before this court can effectuate the Parties' consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/04/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Brian Williams All parties consent.. (Liechty, Robert)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Williams. Dan Pumphrey waiver sent on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Liechty, Robert)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Williams. City of Arvada waiver sent on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/17/2021. (Liechty, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/23/2021. Consent Form due by 10/6/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/13/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/20/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Arvada, Dan Pumphrey (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8026823)Attorney Robert Mark Liechty added to party Brian Williams(pty:pla), filed by Brian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liechty, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Arvada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Williams
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Represented By: Refugio Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Arvada
Represented By: Kylie T Justus
Represented By: Rachel Ann Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Pumphrey
Represented By: Kylie T Justus
Represented By: Rachel Ann Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?