Riley v. Julius Equipment Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Riley
Defendant: Julius Equipment Inc and Andrew Kingen
Case Number: 1:2021cv02249
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 13 October 2021. (cmadr, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gudenkauf, Jacob)
October 13, 2021 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 10/13/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) Modified to correct deadlines on 10/13/2021 (cthom, ).
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order by Defendants Julius Equipment Inc, Andrew Kingen. (Lapidow, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Julius Equipment Inc, Andrew Kingen.(Gudenkauf, Jacob)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cindy Riley. (Temming, Nicholas)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/05/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Cindy Riley All parties consent.. (Temming, Nicholas)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 September 2021. Before the Court is Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #12 ). In light of the information provided by Defendants, this Court's Order (ECF #8 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 9/30/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 by Defendants Julius Equipment Inc, Andrew Kingen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Response to Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Response to Order to Show Cause)(Gudenkauf, Jacob)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Cindy Riley by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Cindy RileyAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Cindy Riley(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Cindy Riley by Nicholas William Temming on behalf of Cindy RileyAttorney Nicholas William Temming added to party Cindy Riley(pty:pla) (Temming, Nicholas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Ian Lapidow on behalf of Julius Equipment Inc, Andrew KingenAttorney Robert Ian Lapidow added to party Julius Equipment Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ian Lapidow added to party Andrew Kingen(pty:dft) (Lapidow, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DISCHARGED, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 August 2021. It is ORDERED that Defendants file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before September 2, 2021, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #13 on 9/8/2021 (cmadr, ).
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE re 5 Administrative Notice, #2 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Julius Equipment Inc, Andrew Kingen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-2 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-3 State Court Clerk Intro Letter, #4 Exhibit A-4 State Court Order re: Court Reporter, #5 Exhibit A-5 State Court Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Julius Equipment, LLC, #6 Exhibit A-6 State Court Proposed Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Julius Equipment, LLC, #7 Exhibit A-7 State Court Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Julius Equipment, LLC, #8 Exhibit B Julius Equipment, Inc. CO Secretary of State Summary, #9 Exhibit C State Court Register of Actions, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Gudenkauf, Jacob)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrew Kingen, Julius Equipment Inc from District Court, Mineral County, Colorado, Case Number 2021CV30001. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8029422), filed by Andrew Kingen, Julius Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-7. Mineral County District Case Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B. Julius Equipment, Inc. CO Secretary of State Summary, #3 Exhibit C. Register of Actions)(Gudenkauf, Jacob)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Julius Equipment Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Riley
Represented By: Nicholas William Temming
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Equipment Inc
Represented By: Robert Ian Lapidow
Represented By: Jacob T Gudenkauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kingen
Represented By: Robert Ian Lapidow
Represented By: Jacob T Gudenkauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?