Ryan v. New Senior Investment Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Ryan
Defendant: New Senior Investment Group Inc., Robert F Savage, Susan Givens, Norman K Jenkins, Michael D. Malone, David H Milner, Frances Aldrich Sevilla-Sacasa, Cassia van der Hoof Holstein and Michael D Malone
Case Number: 1:2021cv02313
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 10
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 10/12/2021. Text Only Entry (angar, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff John Ryan (Acocelli, Richard)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/30/2021. Consent Form due by 10/12/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/19/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/26/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff John Ryan (Acocelli, Richard)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan Givens, Cassia van der Hoof Holstein, Norman K Jenkins, Michael D. Malone, David H Milner, New Senior Investment Group Inc., Robert F Savage, Frances Aldrich Sevilla-Sacasa (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8042288)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party John Ryan(pty:pla), filed by John Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Ryan Civil Civer)(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. New Senior Investment Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ryan
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Senior Investment Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman K Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Milner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Aldrich Sevilla-Sacasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassia van der Hoof Holstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?