Reinhardt v. Raven Industries, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charles Reinhardt
Defendant: Raven Industries, Inc, Jason M Andringa, Thomas S Everist, Janet M Holloway, Kevin T Kirby, Marc E LeBaron, Lois M Martin, Richard W Parod and Daniel A Rykhus
Case Number: 1:2021cv02323
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 10
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 Civil Case Terminated. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Charles Reinhardt (Acocelli, Richard)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to this court's #5 Order, the Parties were to file a completed Consent Form by October 12, 2021. Having not received a completed Consent Form, and having not provided an extension of time to file the Consent Form, a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/21/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Parties shall be prepared to discuss their failure to file the Consent Form by the October 12 deadline. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. The court will automatically vacate the Status Conference upon the filing of a completed Consent Form. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/13/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/30/2021. Consent Form due by 10/12/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/19/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/26/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Charles Reinhardt (Acocelli, Richard)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason M Andringa, Thomas S Everist, Janet M Holloway, Kevin T Kirby, Marc E LeBaron, Lois M Martin, Richard W Parod, Raven Industries, Inc., Daniel A Rykhus (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8044283)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party Charles Reinhardt(pty:pla), filed by Charles Reinhardt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Reinhardt Civil Cover Sheet)(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinhardt v. Raven Industries, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Reinhardt
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raven Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason M Andringa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S Everist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet M Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin T Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc E LeBaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W Parod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A Rykhus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?