Evans v. Colorado Iron & Metal Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua P. Evans and Joshua Evans
Defendant: Colorado Iron & Metal Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02327
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Joshua Evans. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/12/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc4)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02327-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joshua Evans All parties do not consent.. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tamera Dietrich Westerberg on behalf of Colorado Iron & Metal Inc.Attorney Tamera Dietrich Westerberg added to party Colorado Iron & Metal Inc.(pty:dft) (Westerberg, Tamera)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2021 at 10:15 AM is VACATED and RESET for 11/2/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/3/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua Evans. Colorado Iron & Metal Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction form and Setting Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/30/2021. Consent Form is due by 10/14/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order is due 10/21/2021 AND Scheduling Conference is set for 10/28/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (angar, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Colorado Iron & Metal Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8045007)Attorney Leah P. VanLandschoot added to party Joshua P. Evans(pty:pla), filed by Joshua P. Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VanLandschoot, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Colorado Iron & Metal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua P. Evans
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Evans
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Iron & Metal Inc.
Represented By: Tamera Dietrich Westerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?