Hupfer v. Kaufman et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hupfer
Defendant: Caroline Kaufman and Mary Hogan
Case Number: 1:2021cv02332
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Mary Hogan. (Schaffer, Peter)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Caroline Kaufman.(Stern, Adam)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Caroline Kaufman to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, up to and including 10/15/2021, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/23/2021. (ebuch)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Caroline Kaufman. Caroline Kaufman answer due 10/15/2021. (Stern, Adam)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Mary Hogan and Caroline Kaufman by Plaintiff Michael Hupfer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bernstein, Howard)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Mary Hogan and Caroline Kaufman by Plaintiff Michael Hupfer. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bernstein, Howard)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (cpomm, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Mary Hogan (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8045488)Attorney Howard Owen Bernstein added to party Michael Hupfer(pty:pla), filed by Michael Hupfer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernstein, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hupfer v. Kaufman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hupfer
Represented By: Howard Owen Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Kaufman
Represented By: Adam Brett Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hogan
Represented By: Peter J. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?