Bahm v. Elder
Plaintiff: Monte Bahm
Defendant: Bill Elder
Case Number: 1:2021cv02417
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Addressed to Monte Bahm. (angar, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/22/2021. Plaintiff's Prisoner Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is denied as moot. This action was dismissed on October 19, 2021, and judgment was entered the same day. (ECF Nos. #7 , #8 ), This action is closed. (athom, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #7 Order of Dismissal on 10/19/2021. (athom, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to cure the deficiency as ordered. IFP on appeal is denied without prejudice. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/19/2021. (athom, )
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 09/13/2021. Plaintiff must submit a certified account statement. (See "Certificate of Prison Official" at page 4 of Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 form). Pursuant to the September 9 order to cure, Plaintiff has thirty days from the September 9 order in which to do so. He is reminded that this action may be dismissed without further notice if he fails to do so within the time allowed. (athom, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. If Plaintiff fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 09/09/2021. (athom, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Account STATEMENT by Plaintiff Monte Bahm. (athom, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Monte Bahm. (jsalz, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Bill Elder, filed by Monte Bahm. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahm v. Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Bahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?