Stewart v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Stewart
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration, Denver Justice Center, Denver Downtown Partnership and City and County of Denver
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv02419
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed a "Motion for Clarification of the August 23rd Order." ECF No. #11 . But this action was opened on September 7, 2021, and there is no record of an order issued by this Court on August 23rd. Thus, the motion is DENIED. Plaintiff is advised that future filings in this case may be stricken, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/6/2021.(angar, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Clarification of the August 23rd Order, by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Stewart. (angar, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Denver Justice Center, Denver Downtown Partnership, City and County of Denver, filed by Christopher Lee Stewart.(angar, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Dismissing Case. The action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as of September 27, 2021, pursuant to Plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw (ECF No. #8 ), which the Court construes as a notice of voluntary dismissal. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/30/2021. (angar, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Stewart. (alave, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed, by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Stewart. (angar, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Suppress, by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Stewart. (angar, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the Complaint and the action may be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice but may operate as a dismissal with prejudice because of the statutory sixty-day limitations period, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/9/2021. (angar, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/9/2021.(angar, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Stewart. (jsalz, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Social Security Decision against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Christopher Lee Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Downtown Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?