Fernan v. Barnes
Plaintiff: Susan M. Fernan
Defendant: Alan S. Barnes
Case Number: 1:2021cv02453
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 25 October 2021. The Motion to Withdraw by Anna N. Martinez #18 is granted. Ms. Martinez's representation of Plaintiff in this case is terminated. Plaintiff will continue to be represented by Emily N. Benight of Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC. (cmadr, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Susan M. Fernan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, Anna)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emily N. Benight on behalf of Susan M. FernanAttorney Emily N. Benight added to party Susan M. Fernan(pty:pla) (Benight, Emily)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 October 2021. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #15 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #14 ) is discharged. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 23, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 by Defendant Alan S. Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bell, Lori)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7 October 2021. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before October 21, 2021, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #16 on 10/22/2021 (cmadr, ).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/06/2021. (athom, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Alan S. Barnes. (Stewart, Margaret)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Alan S. Barnes All parties consent.. (Stewart, Margaret)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Alan S. Barnes.(Stewart, Margaret)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Natividad Martinez on behalf of Susan M. FernanAttorney Anna Natividad Martinez added to party Susan M. Fernan(pty:pla) (Martinez, Anna)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Summons and Complaint upon Alan Barnes on 08/11/2021. (jtorr, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Alan S. Barnes, filed by Susan M. Fernan.(jtorr, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant by Lori Kathryn Bell on behalf of Alan S. BarnesAttorney Lori Kathryn Bell added to party Alan S. Barnes(pty:dft) (Bell, Lori)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Alan S. Barnes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Stewart, Margaret)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alan S. Barnes from Susan M. Fernan v. Alan S. Barnes, Case Number 21-cv-30455. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8066971), filed by Alan S. Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Cover, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - AOS, #4 Exhibit USDC Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit USDC Supplemental Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernan v. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Fernan
Represented By: Anna Natividad Martinez
Represented By: Emily N. Benight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan S. Barnes
Represented By: Lori Kathryn Bell
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?