Auth Token LLC v. CPI Card Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Auth Token LLC
Defendant: CPI Card Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02557
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant CPI Card Group Inc.. CPI Card Group Inc. answer due 12/15/2021. (Tamkin, Gregory)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 November 2021. At the Plaintiff's emailed request, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for November 29, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for December 21, 2021,1 at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 4-1) on or before December 8, 2021. (cmadr, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auth Token LLC. CPI Card Group Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Wernow, Howard)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 September 2021. Consent Form due by 11/16/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/22/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (csarr, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (mbrow, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (mbrow, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wernow, Howard)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CPI Card Group Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8085061)Attorney Howard Leigh Wernow added to party Auth Token LLC(pty:pla), filed by Auth Token LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US8375212, #2 Exhibit 2-US8688990, #3 Exhibit 3-'212 Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit 4-'990 Claim Chart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auth Token LLC v. CPI Card Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auth Token LLC
Represented By: Howard Leigh Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPI Card Group Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scot Tamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?