Armijo v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rosemary Alice Armijo
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv02604
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/17/2021. Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint [#9 ] is granted. Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 1/25/2022. (athom, )
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pedderson, Danielle)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #1 Complaint filed by Rosemary Alice Armijo. Opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages. Reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/28/2021. (athom, )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #2 Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/28/2021. (athom, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 11/26/2021. Text Only Entry (athom, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Rosemary Alice Armijo. (Rengel, Chelsea)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi Attorney Chelsea Williams Rengel added to party Rosemary Alice Armijo(pty:pla), filed by Rosemary Alice Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rengel, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armijo v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Alice Armijo
Represented By: Chelsea Williams Rengel
Represented By: Dianne D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?