Ellis v. Payne
Plaintiff: Donte Carl Ellis
Defendant: James E. Payne, Dean Williams and Ryan Long
Case Number: 1:2021cv02617
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Robert Bauer on behalf of James E. PayneAttorney Scott Robert Bauer added to party James E. Payne(pty:dft) (Bauer, Scott)
November 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Philip Timothy Barrett on behalf of James E. PayneAttorney Philip Timothy Barrett added to party James E. Payne(pty:dft) (Barrett, Philip)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: James E. Payne answer due 1/2/2022 pursuant to #14 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - Text Only Entry (angar, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Donte Carl Ellis. All parties do not consent. (sdunb, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - executed James E. Payne served on 11/3/2021, answer due 01/02/2022. (sdunb, ) Modified on 11/12/2021 to correct answer due date (sdunb, ). Modified on 11/12/2021 to correct text (angar, ).
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #7 Amended Prisoner Complaint for Service of Process. (sdunb, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1 November 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/11/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. (cmadr, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/1/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/1/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (athom, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DRAWING CASE. It is ORDERED that "Dean Williams" and "Ryan Long" be terminated as defendants in this action because the amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #7 ) does not list them as defendants. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02617-RM. (athom, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against James E. Payne, filed by Donte Carl Ellis. (athom, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Donte Carl Ellis in the amount of $ 52.52; Receipt Number COX100791; Initial PLRA Payment. (athom, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this order, one blank copy of the Prisoner Complaint form, along with the applicable instructions. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 09/30/2021. (athom, ) (form and instructions mailed as ordered)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 09/28/2021. (athom, ) (emailed as ordered)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Donte Carl Ellis. (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Ryan Long, James E. Payne, Dean Williams, filed by Donte Carl Ellis.(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donte Carl Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Payne
Represented By: Philip Timothy Barrett
Represented By: Scott Robert Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?