Rahman v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Najeeb Rahman
Defendant: J. F. Williams, James Billingsly, E. Paultre and Ramon Montes
Case Number: 1:2021cv02625
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Najeeb Rahman in the amount of $ 100.00; Receipt Number COX101246; (evana, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with all directives contained in this order. To be clear, Plaintiff must submit a single, completed amended Prisoner Complaint as one document that contains all claims and allegations. Plaintiff is advised that the Court is not required to sort through multiple pleadings to ascertain his claims or compile the required information from multiple documents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/09/2021. [Forms mailed as ordered] (sdunb, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/7/2021.(sdunb, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER re: Curing Deficiencies per #4 Order by Plaintiff Najeeb Rahman. (sdunb, )
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number provided on this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff submit a certified copy of his inmate account statement showing the most recent six months of activity and the account balance for the period immediately preceding the filing of this action. If Plaintiff fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/29/2021. (sdunb, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Najeeb Rahman. (mbrow, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (mbrow, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against James Billingsly, Ramon Montes, E. Paultre, J. F. Williams, filed by Najeeb Rahman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mbrow, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahman v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najeeb Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. F. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Billingsly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Paultre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?