Anderson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Beverly Ann Anderson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv02634
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 12/29/2021. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/21. Text Only Entry(msklc2, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pedderson, Danielle)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/21. Text Only Entry(msklc2, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Beverly Ann Anderson. (King, Kylan)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: The affidavit submitted in support of the motion is defective for at least two reasons. First, the name signed on the affidavit ("Betty Boop Whipple") is not the name of the Plaintiff in this action. Second, the affidavit represents that it was signed on January 24, 2020, more than a year and a half before this case was filed. As such, the Court is not assured that the representations in the affidavit reflect the Plaintiff's current economic situation. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. Within 7 days of this Order, the Plaintiff shall either submit an amended motion, supported by an adequate affidavit, or pay the filing fee. If the Plaintiff does not comply, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/29/21. Text Only Entry(msklc2, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Utility Setting Answer Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration Answer Due 11/29/2021. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (mbrow, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (mbrow, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02634-MSK. (mbrow, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (mbrow, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorneyKylan J. King. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (mbrow, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Beverly Ann Anderson. (King, Kylan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi Attorney Kylan James King added to party Beverly Ann Anderson(pty:pla), filed by Beverly Ann Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Kylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Ann Anderson
Represented By: Kylan James King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?