Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kevin Isaiah Brown
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv02665
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #5 Order on 11/04/2021. (sdunb, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to cure the deficiencies as directed and to prosecute. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), ECF No. #3 , is denied as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/04/2021. (sdunb, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal will be without prejudice but may operate as a dismissal with prejudice because of the sixty-day limitations period. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/1/2021. (sdunb, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Kevin Isaiah Brown. (cpomm, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Social Security Decision against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Kevin Isaiah Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Isaiah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?